Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates Valentino-Smith, Atterbeary, Cain, Chang, Corderman, D.M. Davis, Ivey, Korman, Lehman, Lierman, Lopez, Patterson, Shetty, and Solomon
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish a meal charge policy that addresses payment for meals, unpaid meal debt, prohibition of stigmatizing action, and other issues related to the administration of school meal programs and management of payments for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education to create and maintain a database of the county board meal charge policies, publish the policies on its website, and report to the General Assembly on certain matters by December 1, 2020 and 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0760
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 10:57 AM