Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
Sponsored by
Calvert County Delegation
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "marina" as it relates to the authority to remove a vessel under the State Boat Act to include all docks, ramps, mooring locations, and pump stations owned and operated by the Calvert County Board of County Commissioners.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - State Boat Act – Removal of Vessels From Marinas – Calvert County Board of County Commissioners Facilities
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page