Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegate West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the graduate social worker license issued by the State Board of Social Work Examiners to be the master social worker license; requiring a specified licensed bachelor social worker or licensed master social worker to submit specified information to the Board to obtain approval by the Board to engage in independent practice; authorizing the Board to reject an application for independent practice if the applicant has not completed the specified supervised experience required; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0986
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416785/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {994131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {573421/1 (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {416785/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 50
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {994131/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Floor Amendment {573421/1 (Senator Nathan-Pulliam) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 69
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 548
Text - Chapter - State Board of Social Work Examiners - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-101, 19-202, 19-302, 19-302.2, 19-306 through 19-309, 19-316.1, 19-318, 19-402, 19-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM