Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bartlett, Cain, Carr, Clippinger, Crutchfield, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Haynes, Hettleman, Johnson, Kelly, R. Lewis, Luedtke, McIntosh, Qi, Shetty, Terrasa, and K. Young
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to treatment for the prevention of human immunodeficiency virus (HIV).
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {223928/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (35-101)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-13)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Arikan) Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Floor Amendment {223928/1 (Delegate Arikan) Rejected (35-101) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-13) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Treatment for the Prevention of HIV - Consent by Minors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM