Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms - Study Extension
Sponsored by
Delegate Clippinger
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain dates by which the Office of the Attorney General is required to provide certain reports to the Governor and the General Assembly relating to firearm crimes, firearm injuries and fatalities, and crime firearms; authorizing the Office to access certain information from the District Court concerning certain protective orders for a certain purpose; requiring an additional report to be submitted by December 1, 2024 by the Office of the Attorney General under a certain Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-40)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748375/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (31-15)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-16)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-42)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms - Study Extension
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms - Study Extension
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-40) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {748375/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (31-15) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (31-16) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-42) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Office of the Attorney General - Firearm Crime, Injuries, Fatalities, and Crime Firearms - Study Extension
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:32 AM
Click to return on the top page