Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Bromwell, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Critical Medical Needs Program in the Office of Home Energy Programs of the Family Investment Administration within the Department of Human Services in recognition of the challenges with energy bills faced by individuals with critical medical needs and limited financial resources; requiring the Office to work with electric and gas companies to implement, for critically medically vulnerable individuals a hold or extension of service for those losing service and restoration where service has been terminated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0425
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {283694/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments {283694/1 Adopted 46
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Text - Chapter - Home Energy Assistance - Critical Medical Needs Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-5A-01, 5-5A-02, 5-5A-06, 5-5A-07, 5-5A-08 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM