Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Washington, Ivey, Barron, Charles, and Williams
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing an exemption for certain check cashing services from provisions of law governing the licensure of check cashing services; authorizing a person to provide check cashing services without obtaining a certain license by registering each year with the Commissioner of Financial Regulation; requiring a person to obtain and maintain a certain identifier to register as a check cashing service; requiring a person to provide the Commissioner with certain information to register as a check cashing service; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0939
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020, October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883799/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {883799/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
Text - Third - Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Registration and Dissemination of Information
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Finance 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM