Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a clerk of the court to prominently post the National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline information sign in public information areas of each courthouse.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Human Trafficking - Required Reporters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {482519/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {548972/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Human Trafficking - Required Reporters
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {482519/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Human Trafficking – Required Posting
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {548972/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Human Trafficking – Required Posting
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Text - Chapter - Human Trafficking – Required Posting
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM