Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a homeowner to have a homestead property tax credit application on file with the State Department of Assessments and Taxation in order to be eligible for a certain credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax to offset certain increases in local income tax revenues; providing that any increase in county property tax revenue that results from the Act may not be counted toward a certain county limitation on county property tax revenue; applying the Act to taxable years after June 30, 2022; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {445763/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-5)
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {445763/1 Adopted 42
House 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (129-5) 43A
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 44
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 445
Text - Chapter - Property Tax - Credit to Offset Increases in Local Income Tax Revenues - Eligibility
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:24 PM