Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting, from a certain tax on certain annual gross revenues derived from certain digital advertising services in the State, advertisement services on digital interfaces owned or operated by or operated on behalf of a broadcast entity and news media entity; prohibiting a person who derives gross revenues from digital advertising services in the State from passing on the cost of the tax to a certain customer in a certain manner; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0787
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
(   7.5-101, 7.5-102 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:25 PM
Click to return on the top page