Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz and Adams
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Environment and Transportation (Delegate Stein)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an individual who hunts deer under a Deer Management Permit in Talbot County to use a rifle approved by the Department of Natural Resources to harvest deer under the permit if the individual holds a valid Maryland State Shooter Qualification Card and subject to the conditions set forth in the permit.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0954
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/11/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Talbot County - Deer Management Permit - Use of Rifles
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Favorable Adopted 45
House 3/14/2017 3/11/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Stein) Adopted 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM