Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Telehealth – Mental Health and Chronic Condition Management Services – Coverage and Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Shetty, Acevero, Atterbeary, Bartlett, Carr, D.M. Davis, Hill, Johnson, Kelly, Korman, Ruth, Saab, Solomon, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, to provide mental health services appropriately delivered through telehealth to a patient in the patient's home setting; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply, on or before December 1, 2020, to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for an amendment to certain waivers to implement a pilot program to provide certain telehealth services to recipients under the Maryland Medical Assistance Program; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {186884/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/03/2020
Legislative Date
4/03/2020
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telehealth - Pilot Program
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {186884/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Telehealth – Mental Health and Chronic Condition Management Services – Coverage and Pilot Program
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Finance 53A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 4/03/2020 4/03/2020 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 17
Text - Chapter - Telehealth – Mental Health and Chronic Condition Management Services – Coverage and Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/16/2020 3:10 PM