Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Cain, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Grammer, Ivey, Kelly, Lierman, Lisanti, Palakovich Carr, Valderrama, and Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year in carrying on a trade or business as a certain medical cannabis grower, processor, dispensary, or independent testing laboratory; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0146
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0568 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 9:52 AM