Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
Sponsored by
The Speaker
Status
In the House - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting an entity from qualifying for certain State benefits unless certain criteria relating to underrepresented communities are met; requiring the Department of Commerce and the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to develop and maintain a State Equity Report; requiring the Department and the Office to adopt regulations to carry out the Act; requiring a certain entity to include certain diversity data in a certain annual report; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533796/1 Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
22AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-40)
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
4/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367673/1
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367673/1 (Finance Committee)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-32)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {823225/1 (Senator Cassilly)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {823225/1 (Senator Cassilly) Withdrawn
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {943627/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {403427/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {773920/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-42)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments {533796/1 Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/03/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 22AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Third Reading Passed (92-40) 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Referred Finance 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 4/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {367673/1 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {367673/1 (Finance Committee) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Committee Amendment Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-32) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Floor Amendment {823225/1 (Senator Cassilly) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Beidle) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Floor Amendment {823225/1 (Senator Cassilly) Withdrawn 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Floor Amendment {943627/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Floor Amendment {403427/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2021 3/15/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Floor Amendment {773920/1 (Senator Reilly) Rejected (15-31) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (95-42) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Corporate Diversity - Board, Executive Leadership, and Mission
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page