Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Sponsored by
Delegates McComas, Arikan, Buckel, Clark, Corderman, Grammer, Hartman, Hettleman, Hornberger, Kittleman, Krebs, Malone, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a local department of social services to place a child for a certain initial placement with a kinship caregiver as an alternative to foster care under certain circumstances; authorizing a local department to place a child with a kinship caregiver if a kinship caregiver is located subsequent to the placement of the child in a foster care setting; specifying that a kinship caregiver may not be under 21 years of age; authorizing a local department to approve an individual as a kinship caregiver under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0024
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59A
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Kinship Caregivers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-501, 5-534 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM