Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Preservation of Environmental Quality and the Climate
Sponsored by
Delegate Lierman
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Public Service Commission to give due consideration to the effect of a generating station, overhead transmission line, or qualified generator lead line on the preservation of environmental quality and the climate before taking final action on an application for a certificate of public convenience and necessity.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0538
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Application for Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Preservation of Environmental Quality and the Climate
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/4/2020 1:35 PM