Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing complainants, respondents, and the Commission on Civil Rights to elect to have claims of public accommodation discrimination determined in a civil action brought by the Commission under certain circumstances and subject to certain requirements; requiring the remedy for public accommodation discrimination to include the greater of certain damages; authorizing the remedy for public accommodation discrimination to include certain remedies; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Relations - Public Accommodation Discrimination - Enforcement and Remedies
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.
House 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/23/2021 6:15 PM
Click to return on the top page