Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Acevero, Hettleman, and Moon
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of certain regulations to prescribe and dispense aids for the cessation of the use of tobacco products; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, by September 1, 2020, to adopt certain regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide coverage for certain services rendered by a licensed pharmacist under the Act to the same extent as certain services rendered by any other licensed health care practitioner; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0497
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-150 )
(   12-101, 12-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM