Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Enforcement and Compliance - New State Positions
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilkins
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, for fiscal 2021, the Department of Budget and Management to create two new State positions for the State Board of Elections for the purpose of employing staff to enforce campaign finance violations and ensure compliance with campaign finance law.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-34)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
51AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Enforcement and Compliance - New State Positions
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing canceled
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Enforcement and Compliance - New State Positions
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (104-34) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Adopted 51AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 449
Text - Chapter - State Board of Elections - Campaign Finance Enforcement and Compliance - New State Positions
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page