Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Sponsored by
Delegates Rose, D. Barnes, Buckel, Corderman, Hornberger, Kelly, Krebs, Long, McComas, Miller, Moon, Reilly, Saab, and Shoemaker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education, beginning in the 2022-2023 school year, to submit a report on or before April 30 each year to the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on computer science courses offered in public schools in the county in the prior school year; requiring each county board to include certain information in the report and post certain data on its website; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Computer Science Courses
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-111.4, 4-111.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM