Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
Sponsored by
Delegates Boteler, Ciliberti, Grammer, and Impallaria
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Declaring the intent of the General Assembly to codify a certain federal regulation concerning preemption of local regulation of amateur radio station antenna structures; establishing certain requirements that apply to a county or municipal ordinance regulating amateur radio station antenna structures; applying the Act to all counties and municipalities; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1177 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46
Text - Third - Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 47
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/13/2020 4:40 PM