Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Cash Transactions During National Coin Shortage
Sponsored by
Delegate Conaway
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring businesses required to file a State sales and use tax return with the Comptroller to account for and pay, with the return, money not returned to customers during the period covered by the return due to a certain national coin shortage, subject to certain exceptions; requiring the Comptroller to pay the money collected under the Act to the General Fund of the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation – Cash Transactions During National Coin Shortage
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/17/2021 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page