Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Hammen, and Lierman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax gross receipts from any charge or fee to participate in an amateur recreational sports event or league; prohibiting the imposition of the admissions and amusement tax in Baltimore City for gross receipts from a charge or fee to participate in an amateur recreational sports event or league collected before July 1, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0499
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/29/2016 3/29/2016 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM