Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsored by
Delegates Mosby, Jones, Kaiser, McIntosh, Davis, Pena-Melnyk, Ali, Barron, Branch, Glenn, C. Howard, Korman, R. Lewis, McMillan, Morales, Oaks, Platt, Queen, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Tarlau, and M. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that the primary purpose of the Problem Gambling Fund is to provide funding for problem gambling treatment and prevention programs; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to use the funds to establish outreach programs for compulsive and problem gamblers and specified other individuals; stating that it is the intent of the General Assembly that, if the expanded purpose of the Fund results in a need for additional funding, the General Assembly will consider legislation to increase specified fees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-43)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {229635/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (85-43)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Adams) Adopted 47
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (97-43) 49
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 46A
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {229635/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Peters) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (85-43) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 845
Text - Chapter - The Problem Gambling Funding and Treatment Act of 2017
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM