Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Computer Equipment
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing, for taxable years 2020 and 2021, a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $180 of the total sales and use tax paid for the purchase of certain computer equipment from March 1, 2020 through June 30, 2021, that is used by students participating in distance or remote learning, regardless of education level, or individuals who work remotely.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Computer Equipment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Computer Equipment
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page