Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain remedy for the payment of an undisputed amount owed under a construction contract applies to certain retention proceeds; reducing from $250,000 to $100,000 the minimum contract amount for the purpose of the applicability of certain provisions of law relating to retention proceeds; and requiring undisputed retention proceeds retained by an owner be paid within 90 days after the date of substantial completion.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1627 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {743696/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {803327/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {743696/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47A
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Kramer) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Floor Amendment {803327/1 (Senator Kramer) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator West) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 68
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 382
Text - Chapter - Real Property - Construction Contracts - Retention Proceeds
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-303, 9-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM