Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Lopez, Acevero, B. Barnes, Barron, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, Charkoudian, Conaway, Corderman, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hornberger, Kelly, Korman, Krimm, Lehman, R. Lewis, Lierman, Love, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Shetty, Stewart, Terrasa, Wells, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Transit Administration to engage in good-faith negotiations with certain jurisdictions and train companies to reach an agreement on a pilot program to establish Maryland Area Regional Commuter train service between Union Station in the District of Columbia and Alexandria Station, Virginia; requiring the Administration to engage in negotiations with Delaware and certain train companies to reach an agreement on a pilot program to establish train service between Perryville, Maryland and Newark, Delaware; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920310/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-27)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {879430/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-20)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/07/2020
Legislative Date
5/07/2020
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {920310/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
Text - Third - Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (107-27) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 51A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {879430/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (111-20) 53
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transit - Maryland Area Regional Commuter Train - Expansion of Service
Post Passage 5/07/2020 5/07/2020 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 10/13/2020 4:35 PM