Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alteration
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering from 3.0 to 2.5 the cumulative grade point average that a certain individual must maintain or have maintained during a certain academic year to qualify for participation in the Maryland Technology Internship Program.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Reassigned to Appropriations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2019
Legislative Date
2/28/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604962/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alteration
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Reassigned to Appropriations 26
House 2/28/2019 2/28/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604962/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Text - Third - Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alteration
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules 63
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-3005 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM