Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Individualized Education Programs - Studies
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, A. Washington, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Frick, Haynes, Healey, Hill, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McComas, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Rey, Turner, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, K. Young, Kittleman, C. Howard, Afzali, Wilkins, Rose, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, Ali, and Hornberger
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with each local school system, to review and assess specified staff allocations related to the participation of children with disabilities in the individualized education program process, the geographic population density of specified children and special education teachers, and recommend resource allocation to effectively assist the parents and guardians of children with disabilities; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly by July 1, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {365065/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {164239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Individualized Education Programs - Studies
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Individualized Education Programs - Studies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Individualized Education Programs - Burden of Proof in Due Process Hearings and Studies
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {365065/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Individualized Education Programs - Burden of Proof in Due Process Hearings and Studies
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {164239/1 Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (34-0) 63A
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Individualized Education Programs - Studies
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715
Text - Chapter - Individualized Education Programs - Studies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM