Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration's annual report on behavioral health services for children and young adults in the State include certain information relating to outpatient and substance-related disorders program services used by children and young adults and behavioral health services provided through telehealth; altering the scope of certain data required to be included in the report; requiring that certain data in the report be grouped by race and ethnicity; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0520
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Services and Voluntary Placement Agreements – Children and Young Adults – Report Modifications
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Referred Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/26/2021 3/06/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Returned Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:26 PM
Click to return on the top page