Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsored by
Delegates Acevero, Charles, Pena-Melnyk, Corderman, W. Fisher, Harrison, Hettleman, Ivey, Jackson, Johnson, Kelly, Lehman, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, McKay, Palakovich Carr, Qi, Queen, Solomon, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Turner, C. Watson, Wilkins, Barron, Bhandari, Carr, Hill, Kerr, Pendergrass, Sample-Hughes, K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility be installed in certain public restrooms in certain public buildings; requiring the Board of Public Works, through the Department of General Services, to adopt certain standards; providing that the Department of General Services, the University System of Maryland, and the Department of Transportation are responsible for the enforcement of certain provisions of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0330
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396883/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-14)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518074/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Committee Amendment {518074/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {518074/1
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Text - First - Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {396883/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518074/1 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Edwards) Adopted 59
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Committee Amendment {518074/1 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Ready) Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {518074/1 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/8 (Senator Ready) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Favorable with Amendments 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 65
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-801 through 2-803 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM