Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that establish the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County; requiring the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Anne Arundel County to be as set by the County Executive and County Council of Anne Arundel County; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {406783/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/10/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Orphans' Court Judges - Salary
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {406783/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Second Reading Passed 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/09/2018 4/05/2018 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County – Orphans’ Court Judges – Compensation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM