Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, Barron, Cain, Cardin, Conaway, Crutchfield, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, W. Fisher, Gilchrist, Guyton, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Ivey, Jalisi, Kelly, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Shetty, Solomon, Sydnor, Terrasa, Valentino-Smith, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
Veto sustained (0-138)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims to be administered by the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and to provide a victim of an alleged rape or sexual offense or a victim of alleged child sexual abuse treatment and follow-up care for postexposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV infection; providing that payments made to certain health care providers from the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board may not exceed a total of $750,000 annually; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0657
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416489/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-138)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations)
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {416489/1 Adopted 53A
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Pilot Program - Alleged Rape, Sexual Offense, or Child Sexual Abuse - HIV Postexposure Prophylaxis
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 54
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Referred Rules 56
Senate 3/29/2019 4/01/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings and Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Adopted 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Veto sustained (0-138)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM