Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsored by
Delegate Sample-Hughes
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from 160 to 100, the number of training hours that a licensed physician is required to perform in a preceptor program rotation in order to qualify for a certain State income tax credit; authorizing a State income tax credit for certain health care practitioners who serve as preceptors for a certain preceptorship program for physician assistant students; requiring the Department to approve applications on a first-come, first-served basis and notify applicants of approval or denial within 45 days after receipt; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021, July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965968/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {965968/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Budget and Taxation 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Returned Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:32 PM
Click to return on the top page