Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding
Sponsored by
Delegate Washington
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending certain funding to each fiscal year; altering the definition of "national capital region" for the purposes of the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program; and requiring 100% of the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Fund to be used for community enhancement projects in sustainable communities located in certain areas in fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0509
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {524566/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-34)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {524566/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Eligibility and Funding
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (99-34) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Budget and Taxation 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 6:48 PM
Click to return on the top page