Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Retired Officer Identification Card
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Correction to provide a certain retiring or retired State correctional officer with a certain identification card under certain circumstances; authorizing the Division of Correction to charge a reasonable fee not to exceed $20 for a certain identification card or a replacement card; requiring that a certain person meet certain requirements to qualify for a certain identification card; and establishing the form and contents of a certain identification card.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Retired Officer Identification Card
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Retired Officer Identification Card
House 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page