Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Impallaria
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an insurer that issues or delivers in the State a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance that provides coverage for the repair of physical damage to the insured motor vehicle to authorize specified repairs to be made using genuine crash parts; prohibiting the insurer from requiring specified repairs to be made using specified aftermarket crash parts or crash parts that are not certified aftermarket crash parts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-501, 10-503, 27-908 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM