Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees - Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definitions of "supervisory employee" and "management personnel" by removing a provision that status as a supervisory employee and management personnel may be determined by certain negotiations between a certain public school employer and a certain employee organization.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0808 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-41)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees - Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46A
Text - Third - Education - Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees - Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (95-41) 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47A
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 731
Text - Chapter - Education - Collective Bargaining for Noncertificated Employees - Supervisory Employees and Management Personnel
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM