Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint
Sponsored by
Delegate Hill
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the time periods within which a person claiming to be aggrieved by a certain discriminatory act or housing practice is required to file a complaint with the Commission on Civil Rights; and altering the date that begins the time period within which certain complaints must be filed.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {116082/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-31)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Human Relations - Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices - Revisions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {116082/1 Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Human Relations – Employment Discrimination and Discriminatory Housing Practices – Time to File Complaint
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (106-31) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
(   20-1004, 20-1020, 20-1021 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page