Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Sponsored by
Delegate Dumais
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "abuse" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes to include the physical or mental injury of a child by a person who, because of the person's position or occupation, exercises authority over the child under specified circumstances; providing that "abuse" does not include the physical injury of a child by accidental means; altering the definition of "mental injury" for the purpose of specified child abuse and neglect statutes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0996
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-4)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Third Reading Passed (132-4) 48
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Text - Chapter - Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Definitions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM