Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale
Sponsored by
Delegates Cullison, Barron, Charkoudian, W. Fisher, Johnson, Kelly, Kerr, R. Lewis, Rosenberg, Smith, Stewart, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale any juvenile product, mattress, upholstered furniture, or reupholstered furniture that contains more than a certain amount of certain chemicals; repealing certain provisions of law regarding the importing, sale, or offering for sale of any child care product containing certain chemicals; establishing certain civil penalties; authorizing a court to enjoin a certain action; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0902
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Products Containing a Flame-Retardant Chemical - Prohibition on Import or Sale
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-306, 24-306.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM