Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Immigration Enforcement – Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses – Policies
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, Acevero, D. Barnes, Cain, Carr, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, R. Lewis, Luedtke, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Patterson, Smith, Turner, Washington, Atterbeary, J. Lewis, Moon, Lopez, Crutchfield, Shetty
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Attorney General, in consultation with the appropriate stakeholders, to develop guidelines to assist public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to draft policies that limit civil immigration enforcement activities on their premises for certain purposes; authorizing public schools, hospitals, and courthouses to establish and publish policies that limit immigration enforcement on their premises to the fullest extent possible consistent with federal and State law and based on the Attorney General's guidelines; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0599
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): November 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {722811/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-36)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
47A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Immigration Enforcement - County Boards of Education, Public Institutions of Higher Education, and Hospitals - Policies
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {722811/1 Adopted 47
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Immigration Enforcement – Public Schools, Hospitals, and Courthouses – Policies
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (93-36) 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 47A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM