Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Johnson, Acevero, Atterbeary, Barron, Boyce, Bridges, Carr, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Henson, Hill, Mosby, Shetty, Smith, Terrasa, Valderrama, Wilkins, and Williams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a police officer to inform a minor of whether the minor is free to leave before questioning the minor for any purpose; requiring a police officer immediately to inform a certain minor that the minor is not free to leave under certain circumstances; requiring a police officer to provide certain notice to a minor's parent, legal guardian, or attorney if the minor has been arrested; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Questioning of Minors by Police Officers
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:27 PM