Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Buckel, Cain, Ebersole, Hornberger, Mosby, Smith, Washington, and Wilkins
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county to set special property tax rates, under certain circumstances, for any subclass of real property that is subject to the county property tax; altering a certain limitation on the county tax rate applicable to personal property and certain operating real property; establishing certain subclasses of real property; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Property Tax - Classifications of Real Property and Authority to Set Special Rates
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 2:14 PM