Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence within the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to act as the statewide information repository for behavioral health treatment and diversion programs related to the criminal justice system; requiring the Center to monitor its models, plans, policies, strategies, programs, technical assistance, and training for opportunities to reduce the disparities in the criminalization of racial minorities with certain disorders; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0857
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {473727/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
42AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Maryland Community Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {473727/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health - Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Finance 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2021 3/14/2021 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 42AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Returned Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Text - Chapter - Health - Maryland Behavioral Health and Public Safety Center of Excellence - Establishment
(   13-4201 through 13-4206 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:15 PM
Click to return on the top page