Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations – Certificate of Need Requirements – Modification
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain requirement that a health maintenance organization or a certain health care facility have a certificate of need before taking certain actions to establish a certain ambulatory surgical facility or center; altering the conditions under which a health maintenance organization or a certain health care facility is required to have a certificate of need before taking certain action to establish a health care project; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0619
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {756982/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Maintenance Organizations – Certificate of Need Requirements – Modification
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {756982/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health Maintenance Organizations – Certificate of Need Requirements – Modification
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text - Chapter - Health Maintenance Organizations – Certificate of Need Requirements – Modification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM