Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of Public Works from approving the acquisition of real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 unless the Board has provided the Legislative Policy Committee with certain information; prohibiting the Board from approving the acquisition of real property with an appraised value of at least $500,000 from the federal government until a study has been completed regarding the ongoing fiscal impact the acquisition would have on the State; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {616184/2 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Clark) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {443624/1 (Delegate Clark) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-38)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {553721/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {616184/2 Adopted 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/04 (Delegate Clark) Adopted 60
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Floor Amendment {443624/1 (Delegate Clark) Adopted 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 62
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-38) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Floor Amendment {553721/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM