Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, P. Young, Pendergrass, Cullison, Hill, Kipke, and Miele
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from a 6-month to a 12-month period, the length for which a certain insurer, nonprofit health service plan, and health maintenance organization is required to provide coverage for a single dispensing of a supply of prescription contraceptives; providing that a certain provision of the Act may not be construed to require a provider to prescribe, furnish, or dispense contraceptives for 12 months at one time; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {416482/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {416482/1 Adopted 47
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
House 3/19/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Finance 48B
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Prescription Contraceptives - Coverage for Single Dispensing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-826.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM