Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization
Sponsored by
Delegates Mautz, Anderton, Arikan, Buckel, Chisholm, Cox, Hornberger, Mangione, McComas, and Morgan
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to reclassify an oyster sanctuary in which the oyster population has declined by 15% or more over a 10-year period as an oyster growth sanctuary; establishing the purpose of an oyster growth sanctuary; requiring that any activity conducted in an oyster growth sanctuary comply with certain adaptive management practices; and requiring that an oyster growth sanctuary be considered an oyster sanctuary for purposes of calculating a certain oyster habitat objective.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0678
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/2/2020 10:58 AM