Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Sponsored by
Delegate Barron
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of law do not prohibit a certain physician from dispensing a certain topical medication; authorizing a physician to dispense a certain topical medication if the physician meets certain requirements and has obtained a certain written permit; authorizing the State Board of Physicians to issue a certain written permit to certain physicians under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0916
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1063 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Physicians - Dispensing Permit Exemption - Prepackaged Topical
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {256486/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {884832/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text - First - Physicians - Dispensing Permit Exemption - Prepackaged Topical
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {256486/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments {884832/1 Adopted 59A
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59A
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 60
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 535
Text - Chapter - Physicians – Dispensing Permit Exemption – Topical Medication
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 14-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM